House | 05/26/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Meeting postponed (05/10/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |