House | 06/02/2023 | Referred to House Finance | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Senate passed Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/18/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |