Senate | 06/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/19/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | Proposed Substitute | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |