Senate | 06/14/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Meeting postponed (04/20/2023) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |