Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session

Rhode Island Senate Bill S0997 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2023 -- S 0997
66 ========
77 LC002826
88 ========
99 S TATE OF RHODE IS LAND
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2023
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -
1616 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
1717 Introduced By: Senators Ciccone, DiPalma, Lombardo, F. Lombardi, and Lawson
1818 Date Introduced: May 15, 2023
1919 Referred To: Senate Finance
2020
2121
2222 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2323 SECTION 1. Section 36-10-2 of the General Laws in Chapter 36-10 entitled "Retirement 1
2424 System — Contributions and Benefits" is hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2525 36-10-2. State contributions. 3
2626 (a) The State of Rhode Island shall make its contribution for the maintenance of the system, 4
2727 including the proper and timely payment of benefits in accordance with the provisions of this 5
2828 chapter and chapters 8, 16, 28, 31 and 42 of this title, by annually appropriating an amount equal 6
2929 to a percentage of the total compensation paid to the active membership. The percentage shall be 7
3030 computed by the actuary employed by the retirement system and shall be certified by the retirement 8
3131 board to the director of administration on or before the fifteenth day of October in each year. In 9
3232 arriving at the yearly employer contribution the actuary shall determine the value of: 10
3333 (1) The contributions made by the members; 11
3434 (2) Income on investments; and 12
3535 (3) Other income of the system. 13
3636 (b) The actuary shall thereupon compute the yearly employer contribution that will: 14
3737 (1) Pay the actuarial estimate of the normal cost for the next succeeding fiscal year; and 15
3838 (2) Amortize the unfunded liability of the system in accordance with § 36-10-2.1(b). 16
3939 (c) The State of Rhode Island shall remit to the general treasurer the employer’s share of 17
4040 the contribution for state employees, state police, and judges on a payroll frequency basis on the 18
4141
4242
4343 LC002826 - Page 2 of 4
4444 date contributions are withheld but no later than three (3) business days following the pay period 1
4545 ending in which contributions were withheld, and for teachers in a manner pursuant to § 16-16-22. 2
4646 (d)(1) In accordance with the intent of § 36-8-20 that the retirement system satisfy the 3
4747 requirements of § 401(a) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, the state shall pay to the retirement 4
4848 system: 5
4949 (i) By June 30, 1995, an amount equal to the sum of the benefits paid to state legislators 6
5050 pursuant to § 36-10-10.1 in excess of ten thousand dollars ($10,000) per member (plus accrued 7
5151 interest on such amount at eight percent (8%)) for all fiscal years beginning July 1, 1991, and ending 8
5252 June 30, 1995, but this amount shall be paid only if § 36-10-10.1(e) becomes effective January 1, 9
5353 1995; and 10
5454 (ii) By December 31, 1994, twenty million seven hundred eighty eight thousand eight 11
5555 hundred twelve dollars and nineteen cents ($20,788,812.19) plus accrued interest on that amount 12
5656 at eight percent (8%) compounded monthly beginning March 1, 1991, and ending on the date this 13
5757 payment is completed (reduced by amortized amounts already repaid to the retirement system with 14
5858 respect to the amounts withdrawn by the state during the fiscal year July 1, 1990 — June 30, 1991); 15
5959 and 16
6060 (iii) By June 30, 1995, the sum of the amounts paid by the retirement system for retiree 17
6161 health benefits described in § 36-12-4 for all fiscal years beginning July 1, 1989, and ending June 18
6262 30, 1994, to the extent that the amounts were not paid from the restricted fund described in 19
6363 subsection (c). 20
6464 (2) Any and all amounts paid to the retirement system under this subsection shall not 21
6565 increase the amount otherwise payable to the system by the state of Rhode Island under subsection 22
6666 (a) for the applicable fiscal year. The actuary shall make such adjustments in the amortization bases 23
6767 and other accounts of the retirement system as he or she deems appropriate to carry out the 24
6868 provisions and intent of this subsection. 25
6969 (e) In addition to the contributions provided for in subsections (a) through (c) and in order 26
7070 to provide supplemental employer contributions to the retirement system, commencing in fiscal 27
7171 year 2006, and each year thereafter: 28
7272 (1) Except for fiscal year 2009, fiscal year 2010, and fiscal year 2011, for each fiscal year 29
7373 in which the actuarially determined state contribution rate for state employees, including state 30
7474 contributions under chapter 10.3 of this title, is lower than that for the prior fiscal year, the governor 31
7575 shall include an appropriation to that system equivalent to twenty percent (20%) of the rate 32
7676 reduction for the state’s contribution rate for state employees to be applied to the actuarial accrued 33
7777 liability of the state employees’ retirement system for state employees for each fiscal year; 34
7878
7979
8080 LC002826 - Page 3 of 4
8181 (2) Except for fiscal year 2009, fiscal year 2010, and fiscal year 2011, for each fiscal year 1
8282 in which the actuarially determined state contribution rate for teachers, including state contributions 2
8383 under chapter 10.3 of this title, is lower than that for the prior fiscal year, the governor shall include 3
8484 an appropriation to that system equivalent to twenty percent (20%) of the rate reduction for the 4
8585 state’s share of the contribution rate for teachers to be applied to the actuarial accrued liability of 5
8686 the state employees’ retirement system for teachers for each fiscal year; 6
8787 (3) For each fiscal year in which the vacancies for authorized and appropriated full-time 7
8888 equivalent positions for state employees exceeds three (3%) percent, and those positions are 8
8989 substituted with contract employees, the governor shall include an appropriation to that system 9
9090 equivalent to the average annual employer contribution for each vacant position. 10
9191 (3)(4) The amounts to be appropriated shall be included in the annual appropriation bill 11
9292 and shall be paid by the general treasurer into the retirement system. 12
9393 (4)(5) Assessments pursuant to § 42-149-3.1 shall be included in the annual appropriation 13
9494 bill and shall be paid by the general treasurer into the retirement system beginning FY2013. 14
9595 (f) While the retirement system’s actuary shall not adjust the computation of the annual 15
9696 required contribution for the year in which supplemental contributions are received, the 16
9797 contributions once made may be treated as reducing the actuarial liability remaining for 17
9898 amortization in the next following actuarial valuation to be performed. 18
9999 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 19
100100 ========
101101 LC002826
102102 ========
103103
104104
105105 LC002826 - Page 4 of 4
106106 EXPLANATION
107107 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
108108 OF
109109 A N A C T
110110 RELATING TO PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -
111111 CONTRIBUTIONS AND BE NEFITS
112112 ***
113113 This act would provide that vacancies in excess of three percent (3%) for full-time 1
114114 equivalent state employees which are substituted with contract employees shall require an 2
115115 appropriation to the pension fund equal to the average annual employer contribution for each vacant 3
116116 position. 4
117117 This act would take effect upon passage. 5
118118 ========
119119 LC002826
120120 ========
121121