Senate | 06/22/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |