Senate | 06/12/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2023) | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Referred to House Special Legislation | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/25/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |