Senate | 06/23/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/30/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2023) | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |