Senate | 06/16/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/08/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/01/2023) | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/23/2023) |