Senate | 06/22/2023 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/09/2023 | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/12/2023) | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
House | 05/31/2023 | Referred to House Corporations | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/30/2023) |