Senate | 06/20/2023 | Signed by Governor | ||
Senate | 06/15/2023 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | House passed in concurrence | ||
House | 06/12/2023 | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2023) | ||
Senate | 06/02/2023 | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |