House | 03/27/2025 | House read and passed | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Placed on House Calendar (03/27/2025) | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (03/20/2025) | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2025) | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |