Senate | 05/23/2025 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 05/08/2025 | House read and passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on House Calendar (05/08/2025) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (04/03/2025) | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2025) | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |