House | 04/04/2025 | Effective without Governor's signature | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Transmitted to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/27/2025) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2025) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Senate Finance | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 02/21/2025 | Placed on House Calendar (02/25/2025) | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (02/12/2025) | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2025) | ||
House | 01/31/2025 | Introduced, referred to House Education |