Rhode Island 2025 Regular Session

Rhode Island House Bill H5533 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33
44
55 2025 -- H 5533
66 ========
77 LC001136
88 ========
99 S T A T E O F R H O D E I S L A N D
1010 IN GENERAL ASSEMBLY
1111 JANUARY SESSION, A.D. 2025
1212 ____________
1313
1414 A N A C T
1515 RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID
1616 Introduced By: Representatives Cortvriend, McGaw, Cotter, Chippendale, Newberry,
1717 Place, Edwards, Corvese, Noret, and Donovan
1818 Date Introduced: February 13, 2025
1919 Referred To: House Finance
2020
2121
2222 It is enacted by the General Assembly as follows:
2323 SECTION 1. Section 45-13-1 of the General Laws in Chapter 45-13 entitled "State Aid" is 1
2424 hereby amended to read as follows: 2
2525 45-13-1. Apportionment of annual appropriation for state aid. 3
2626 (a) As used in this chapter, the following words and terms have the following meanings: 4
2727 (1) “Income” means the most recent estimate of per-capita income for a city, town or 5
2828 county as reported by the United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census. 6
2929 (2) “Population” means the most recent estimates of population for each city and town as 7
3030 reported by the United States Department of Commerce, Bureau of the Census. 8
3131 (3) “Reference year” means the second fiscal year preceding the beginning of the fiscal 9
3232 year in which the distribution of state aid to cities and towns is made provided however that the 10
3333 reference year for distributions made in fiscal year 2007-2008 shall be the third fiscal year 11
3434 preceding the beginning of the fiscal year 2007-2008 and provided further that the reference year 12
3535 for distributions made in fiscal year 2008-2009 shall be the fourth fiscal year preceding the 13
3636 beginning of the fiscal year 2008-2009. 14
3737 (4) “Tax effort” means the total taxes imposed by a city or town for public purposes or the 15
3838 totals of those taxes for the cities or towns within a county (except employee and employer 16
3939 assessments and contributions to finance retirement and social insurance systems and other special 17
4040 assessments for capital outlay) determined by the United States Secretary of Commerce for general 18
4141 statistical purposes and adjusted to exclude amounts properly allocated to education expenses. 19
4242
4343
4444 LC001136 - Page 2 of 4
4545 (b) Aid to cities and towns shall be apportioned as follows: For each county, city or town, 1
4646 let R be the tax effort divided by the square of per capita income, i.e., R = (tax effort)/(income x 2
4747 income). 3
4848 The amount to be allocated to the counties shall be apportioned in the ratio of the value of 4
4949 R for each county divided by the sum of the values of R for all five (5) counties. 5
5050 The amount to be allocated for all cities and for all towns within a county shall be the 6
5151 allocation for that county apportioned proportionally to the total tax effort of the towns and cities 7
5252 in that county. 8
5353 The amount to be allocated to any city or town is the amount allocated to all cities or all 9
5454 towns within the county apportioned in the ratio of the value of R for that city (or town) divided by 10
5555 the sum of the values of R for all cities (or all towns) in that county; provided, further, that no city 11
5656 or town shall receive an entitlement in excess of one hundred forty-five percent (145%) of that city 12
5757 or town’s population multiplied by the average per capita statewide amount of the annual 13
5858 appropriation for state aid to cities and towns. Any excess entitlement shall be allocated to the 14
5959 remainder of the cities and towns in the respective county in accordance with the provisions of this 15
6060 section. 16
6161 For fiscal year 2004, notwithstanding the provisions of subsection (a), aid calculations shall 17
6262 be based on a blended rate of ninety percent (90%) of the data from the 1990 census and ten percent 18
6363 (10%) of the data from the 2000 census. In each of the succeeding nine (9) fiscal years, the 19
6464 calculations shall be based on a blended rate that increases the percentage of data utilized from the 20
6565 2000 census by ten percent (10%) from the previous year and decreases the percentage of the data 21
6666 utilized from the 1990 census by ten percent (10%) from the previous year. 22
6767 (c) The total amount of aid to be apportioned pursuant to subsection (b) above shall be 23
6868 specified in the annual appropriation act of the state and shall be equal to the following: 24
6969 (1) For fiscal years ending June 30, 1994 through June 30, 1998, the total amount of aid 25
7070 shall be based upon one percent (1%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 26
7171 (2) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 1999, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 27
7272 one and three-tenths percent (1.3%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 28
7373 (3) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2000, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 29
7474 one and seven-tenths percent (1.7%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 30
7575 (4) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2001, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 31
7676 two percent (2.0%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 32
7777 (5) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2002, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 33
7878 two and four-tenths percent (2.4%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 34
7979
8080
8181 LC001136 - Page 3 of 4
8282 (6) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2003, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 1
8383 two and four-tenths percent (2.4%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 2
8484 (7) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2004, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 3
8585 two and seven-tenths percent (2.7%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 4
8686 (8) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2005, the total amount of aid shall be fifty-two 5
8787 million four hundred thirty-eight thousand five hundred thirty-two dollars ($52,438,532). 6
8888 (9) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006, the total amount of aid shall be based upon 7
8989 three percent (3%) of total state tax revenues in the reference year. 8
9090 (10) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2007 the total amount of aid shall be sixty-four 9
9191 million six hundred ninety-nine thousand three dollars ($64,699,003). 10
9292 (11) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008, the total amount of aid shall be sixty-four 11
9393 million six hundred ninety-nine thousand three dollars ($64,699,003). 12
9494 (12) [Deleted by P.L. 2009, ch. 68, art. 6, section 3.] 13
9595 (13) [Deleted by P.L. 2007, ch. 73, art. 25, section 1.] 14
9696 (14) [Deleted by P.L. 2007, ch. 73, art. 25, section 1.] 15
9797 (d) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008 the apportionments of state aid as derived 16
9898 through the calculations as required by subsections (a) through (c) of this section shall be adjusted 17
9999 downward statewide by ten million dollars ($10,000,000). 18
100100 (e) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009, the total amount of aid shall be twenty-five 19
101101 million dollars ($25,000,000) with such distribution allocated proportionately on the same basis as 20
102102 the original enactment of general revenue sharing of FY 2009. 21
103103 (f) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009 and thereafter, funding shall be determined by 22
104104 appropriation. 23
105105 (g) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2026, the total amount of aid shall be thirty-nine 24
106106 million dollars ($39,000,000) to be allocated and distributed based on population as determined by 25
107107 the 2020 census. 26
108108 (h) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2027 and thereafter, aid shall be increased by the 27
109109 total percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban Consumers (CPI-U). 28
110110 SECTION 2. This act shall take effect upon passage. 29
111111 ========
112112 LC001136
113113 ========
114114
115115
116116 LC001136 - Page 4 of 4
117117 EXPLANATION
118118 BY THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
119119 OF
120120 A N A C T
121121 RELATING TO TOWNS AN D CITIES -- STATE AID
122122 ***
123123 This act would reinstate general revenue sharing of state aid among the thirty-nine cities 1
124124 and towns in Rhode Island. The initial amount would be based upon population, and would be 2
125125 increased annually thereafter based on the increase in the Consumer Price Index for all Urban 3
126126 Consumers. 4
127127 This act would take effect upon passage. 5
128128 ========
129129 LC001136
130130 ========