Senate | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | House read and passed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on House Calendar (04/29/2025) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee recommends passage | ||
House | 04/18/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (04/22/2025) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2025) | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |