House | 04/03/2025 | House passed Sub A | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Placed on House Calendar (04/03/2025) | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Proposed Substitute | ||
House | 03/21/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (03/25/2025) | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2025) | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |