Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/08/2025) | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Scheduled for consideration (05/01/2025) | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Meeting postponed (04/22/2025) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2025 | Scheduled for consideration | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2025) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |