House | 04/10/2025 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2025) | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Senate read and passed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/11/2025) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Committee recommends passage | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2025) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |