Senate | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read third time and sent to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-7 | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.Moore | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Prefiled |