Senate | 04/01/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
03/27/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
House | 03/27/2025 | Read third time and sent to Senate | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-18 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Magnuson, Beach, Pace, Frank, White, Cromer, Gilreath, Ligon, Terribile, B Newton, Jordan, Guest | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Schuessler, Hixon | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Guest, Crawford | ||
House | 12/05/2024 | Prefiled |