House | 04/08/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, Yow | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope, B.Newton | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Brewer | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wooten | ||
House | 02/04/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Grant | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Prefiled |