LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
South Carolina SC
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
House
Bills
H3856
Draft Versions
SC
South Carolina House Bill H3856
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session
South Carolina House Bill H3856
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note
February 11, 2025
Bill
January 30, 2025
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 9, 2025
Compare
Bill
April 8, 2025
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 4, 2025
Compare
Bill
April 2, 2025
Compare