South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H3944 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
22
33 Bill 3944
44
55 Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
66
77 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
88
9-Amended April 22, 2025 H. 3944 Introduced by Reps. Erickson and Vaughan S. Printed 4/22/25--H. Read the first time February 11, 2025 ________
9+Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter Committee Report April 9, 2025 H. 3944 Introduced by Reps. Erickson and Vaughan S. Printed 4/9/25--H. Read the first time February 11, 2025 ________ The committee on House Education and Public Works To whom was referred a Bill (H. 3944) to amend the South Carolina Code of Laws by amending Section 56-5-4160, relating to weighing vehicles and their loads, unloading their excess weight, and penalties, etc., respectfully Report: That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass with amendment: Amend the bill, as and if amended, SECTION 1, Section 56-5-4160, by adding a subsection to read: (O) The exception provided in subsection (N) shall expire on July 1, 2030. Renumber sections to conform. Amend title to conform. SHANNON ERICKSON for Committee. _______
1010
11-Amended
11+Indicates Matter Stricken
1212
13-April 22, 2025
13+Indicates New Matter
14+
15+Committee Report
16+
17+April 9, 2025
1418
1519 H. 3944
1620
1721 Introduced by Reps. Erickson and Vaughan
1822
19-S. Printed 4/22/25--H.
23+S. Printed 4/9/25--H.
2024
2125 Read the first time February 11, 2025
2226
2327 ________
2428
25-A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 56-5-4160, RELATING TO WEIGHING VEHICLES AND THEIR LOADS, UNLOADING THEIR EXCESS WEIGHT, AND PENALTIES, SO AS TO PROVIDE MAXIMUM WEIGHTS FOR ELECTRIC BATTERY POWERED MOTOR VEHICLES. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Section 56-5-4160 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding: (N) Any motor vehicle that is primarily powered by means of an electric battery shall be allowed to exceed the gross, single axle, tandem axle, or bridge formula weight limits, including tolerances, by no more than two thousand pounds each individually weighed, up to a maximum gross vehicle weight of eighty-two thousand pounds. This provision also applies on the interstate as allowed by federal law. (O) The exception provided in subsection (N) shall expire on July 1, 2030. SECTION 2. This act takes effect upon approval by the Governor. ----XX----
29+The committee on House Education and Public Works
30+
31+To whom was referred a Bill (H. 3944) to amend the South Carolina Code of Laws by amending Section 56-5-4160, relating to weighing vehicles and their loads, unloading their excess weight, and penalties, etc., respectfully
32+
33+Report:
34+
35+That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass with amendment:
36+
37+Amend the bill, as and if amended, SECTION 1, Section 56-5-4160, by adding a subsection to read:
38+
39+(O) The exception provided in subsection (N) shall expire on July 1, 2030.
40+
41+Renumber sections to conform.
42+
43+Amend title to conform.
44+
45+SHANNON ERICKSON for Committee.
46+
47+_______
48+
49+A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 56-5-4160, RELATING TO WEIGHING VEHICLES AND THEIR LOADS, UNLOADING THEIR EXCESS WEIGHT, AND PENALTIES, SO AS TO PROVIDE MAXIMUM WEIGHTS FOR ELECTRIC BATTERY POWERED MOTOR VEHICLES. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Section 56-5-4160 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding: (N) Any motor vehicle that is primarily powered by means of an electric battery shall be allowed to exceed the gross, single axle, tandem axle, or bridge formula weight limits, including tolerances, by no more than two thousand pounds each individually weighed, up to a maximum gross vehicle weight of eighty-two thousand pounds. This provision also applies on the interstate as allowed by federal law. SECTION 2. This act takes effect upon approval by the Governor. ----XX----
2650
2751 A bill
2852
2953 TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 56-5-4160, RELATING TO WEIGHING VEHICLES AND THEIR LOADS, UNLOADING THEIR EXCESS WEIGHT, AND PENALTIES, SO AS TO PROVIDE MAXIMUM WEIGHTS FOR ELECTRIC BATTERY POWERED MOTOR VEHICLES.
3054
3155 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina:
3256
3357 SECTION 1. Section 56-5-4160 of the S.C. Code is amended by adding:
3458
3559 (N) Any motor vehicle that is primarily powered by means of an electric battery shall be allowed to exceed the gross, single axle, tandem axle, or bridge formula weight limits, including tolerances, by no more than two thousand pounds each individually weighed, up to a maximum gross vehicle weight of eighty-two thousand pounds. This provision also applies on the interstate as allowed by federal law.
3660
37-(O) The exception provided in subsection (N) shall expire on July 1, 2030.
38-
3961 SECTION 2. This act takes effect upon approval by the Governor.
4062
4163 ----XX----
4264
43-This web page was last updated on April 22, 2025 at 07:26 PM
65+This web page was last updated on April 09, 2025 at 09:40 PM