05/07/2025 | Effective date 04/28/25 | |||
04/28/2025 | Signed By Governor | |||
04/24/2025 | Ratified R 25 | |||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read third time and enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Read third time and sent to Senate | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Delegation report: Favorable Lexington Delegation | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to Lexington Delegation | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Introduced and read first time |