Senate | 05/06/2025 | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Read third time and sent to Senate | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Roll call Yeas-118 Nays-0 | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.Moore, Rivers, Anderson | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |