South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4303 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
22
33 Bill 4303
44
55 Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
66
77 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
88
9-Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter Amended May 1, 2025 H. 4303 Introduced by Reps. Gatch, Cobb-Hunter, Sessions, M. M. Smith, Brewer, Rutherford, Gagnon, Guest, Guffey, Weeks, Hosey and Yow S. Printed 5/1/25--H. Read the first time April 3, 2025 ________
9+Indicates Matter Stricken Indicates New Matter Committee Report April 30, 2025 H. 4303 Introduced by Reps. Gatch, Cobb-Hunter, Sessions, M. M. Smith, Brewer, Rutherford, Gagnon, Guest, Guffey, Weeks, Hosey and Yow S. Printed 4/30/25--H. Read the first time April 3, 2025 ________ The committee on House Ways and Means To whom was referred a Bill (H. 4303) to amend the South Carolina Code of Laws by amending Section 12-21-620, relating to tax rates on products containing tobacco, so as to tax cigarettes for heating, etc., respectfully Report: That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass with amendment: Amend the bill, as and if amended, SECTION 1, by striking Section 12-21-620(A)(2) and inserting: (2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, one and one-quarterfourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette; Renumber sections to conform. Amend title to conform. B.W. BANNISTER for Committee. _______
1010
1111 Indicates Matter Stricken
1212
1313 Indicates New Matter
1414
15-Amended
15+Committee Report
1616
17-May 1, 2025
17+April 30, 2025
1818
1919 H. 4303
2020
2121 Introduced by Reps. Gatch, Cobb-Hunter, Sessions, M. M. Smith, Brewer, Rutherford, Gagnon, Guest, Guffey, Weeks, Hosey and Yow
2222
23-S. Printed 5/1/25--H.
23+S. Printed 4/30/25--H.
2424
2525 Read the first time April 3, 2025
2626
2727 ________
2828
29-A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO TAX RATES ON PRODUCTS CONTAINING TOBACCO, SO AS TO TAX CIGARETTES FOR HEATING ONE AND ONE-QUARTER mills ON EACH CIGARETTE. Amend Title To Conform Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Section 12-21-620 of the S.C. Code is amended to read: Section 12-21-620. (A) There shall be levied, assessed, collected, and paid in respect to the articles containing tobacco enumerated in this section the following amounts: (1) upon all cigarettes for smoking made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, three and one-half mills on each cigarette; (2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, fourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette; (2)(3) upon all tobacco products, as defined in Section 12-21-800, five percent of the manufacturer's price. Manufacturer's price as used in this section is the established price at which a manufacturer sells to a wholesaler. (B) As used in this section, "cigarette" means: (1) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco wrapped in paper or in any substance other than a tobacco leaf; or (2) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, wrapped in any substance, weighing three pounds per thousand or less, however labeled or named, which because of its appearance, size, type of tobacco used in the filler, or its packaging, pricing, marketing, or labeling, is likely to be offered to, or purchased by, consumers as a cigarette described in item (1) of this subsection. SECTION 2. This act takes effect October 1, 2025. ----XX----
29+The committee on House Ways and Means
30+
31+To whom was referred a Bill (H. 4303) to amend the South Carolina Code of Laws by amending Section 12-21-620, relating to tax rates on products containing tobacco, so as to tax cigarettes for heating, etc., respectfully
32+
33+Report:
34+
35+That they have duly and carefully considered the same, and recommend that the same do pass with amendment:
36+
37+Amend the bill, as and if amended, SECTION 1, by striking Section 12-21-620(A)(2) and inserting:
38+
39+(2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, one and one-quarterfourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette;
40+
41+Renumber sections to conform.
42+
43+Amend title to conform.
44+
45+B.W. BANNISTER for Committee.
46+
47+_______
48+
49+A bill TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO TAX RATES ON PRODUCTS CONTAINING TOBACCO, SO AS TO TAX CIGARETTES FOR HEATING ONE AND ONE-QUARTER mills ON EACH CIGARETTE. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina: SECTION 1. Section 12-21-620 of the S.C. Code is amended to read: Section 12-21-620. (A) There shall be levied, assessed, collected, and paid in respect to the articles containing tobacco enumerated in this section the following amounts: (1) upon all cigarettes for smoking made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, three and one-half mills on each cigarette; (2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, one and one-quarter mills on each cigarette; (2)(3) upon all tobacco products, as defined in Section 12-21-800, five percent of the manufacturer's price. Manufacturer's price as used in this section is the established price at which a manufacturer sells to a wholesaler. (B) As used in this section, "cigarette" means: (1) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco wrapped in paper or in any substance other than a tobacco leaf; or (2) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, wrapped in any substance, weighing three pounds per thousand or less, however labeled or named, which because of its appearance, size, type of tobacco used in the filler, or its packaging, pricing, marketing, or labeling, is likely to be offered to, or purchased by, consumers as a cigarette described in item (1) of this subsection. SECTION 2. This act takes effect October 1, 2025. ----XX----
3050
3151 A bill
3252
3353 TO AMEND THE SOUTH CAROLINA CODE OF LAWS BY AMENDING SECTION 12-21-620, RELATING TO TAX RATES ON PRODUCTS CONTAINING TOBACCO, SO AS TO TAX CIGARETTES FOR HEATING ONE AND ONE-QUARTER mills ON EACH CIGARETTE.
34-
35-Amend Title To Conform
3654
3755 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of South Carolina:
3856
3957 SECTION 1. Section 12-21-620 of the S.C. Code is amended to read:
4058
4159 Section 12-21-620. (A) There shall be levied, assessed, collected, and paid in respect to the articles containing tobacco enumerated in this section the following amounts:
4260
4361 (1) upon all cigarettes for smoking made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, three and one-half mills on each cigarette;
4462
45-(2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, fourteen and one-quarter mills on each cigarette;
63+(2) upon all cigarettes for heating made of tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, one and one-quarter mills on each cigarette;
4664
4765 (2)(3) upon all tobacco products, as defined in Section 12-21-800, five percent of the manufacturer's price.
4866
4967 Manufacturer's price as used in this section is the established price at which a manufacturer sells to a wholesaler.
5068
5169 (B) As used in this section, "cigarette" means:
5270
5371 (1) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco wrapped in paper or in any substance other than a tobacco leaf; or
5472
5573 (2) any roll for smoking or heating under ordinary conditions of use containing tobacco or any substitute for tobacco, wrapped in any substance, weighing three pounds per thousand or less, however labeled or named, which because of its appearance, size, type of tobacco used in the filler, or its packaging, pricing, marketing, or labeling, is likely to be offered to, or purchased by, consumers as a cigarette described in item (1) of this subsection.
5674
5775 SECTION 2. This act takes effect October 1, 2025.
5876
5977 ----XX----
6078
61-This web page was last updated on May 01, 2025 at 08:31 PM
79+This web page was last updated on April 30, 2025 at 11:29 PM