South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4415 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 05/06/2025

                            South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026

(Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)

Recalled May 6, 2025  H. 4415  Introduced by Reps. Gilliam, Alexander, Anderson, Atkinson, Bailey, Ballentine, Bamberg, Bannister, Bauer, Beach, Bernstein, Bowers, Bradley, Brewer, Brittain, Burns, Bustos, Calhoon, Caskey, Chapman, Chumley, Clyburn, Cobb-Hunter, Collins, B. J. Cox, B. L. Cox, Crawford, Cromer, Davis, Dillard, Duncan, Edgerton, Erickson, Forrest, Frank, Gagnon, Garvin, Gatch, Gibson, Gilliard, Gilreath, Govan, Grant, Guest, Guffey, Haddon, Hager, Hardee, Harris, Hart, Hartnett, Hartz, Hayes, Henderson-Myers, Herbkersman, Hewitt, Hiott, Hixon, Holman, Hosey, Howard, Huff, J. E. Johnson, J. L. Johnson, Jones, Jordan, Kilmartin, King, Kirby, Landing, Lawson, Ligon, Long, Lowe, Luck, Magnuson, Martin, May, McCabe, McCravy, McDaniel, McGinnis, Mitchell, Montgomery, J. Moore, T. Moore, Morgan, Moss, Murphy, Neese, B. Newton, W. Newton, Oremus, Pace, Pedalino, Pope, Rankin, Reese, Rivers, Robbins, Rose, Rutherford, Sanders, Schuessler, Sessions, G. M. Smith, M. M. Smith, Spann-Wilder, Stavrinakis, Taylor, Teeple, Terribile, Vaughan, Waters, Weeks, Wetmore, White, Whitmire, Wickensimer, Williams, Willis, Wooten and Yow   S. Printed 5/6/25--S. Read the first time April 24, 2025  ________          A concurrent RESOLUTION  TO DECLARE SATURDAY, JUNE 14, 2025, AS UNITED STATES ARMY DAY IN SOUTH CAROLINA AND TO ENCOURAGE ALL CITIZENS OF THIS GREAT STATE TO REFLECT UPON THE PROFOUND SENSE OF DUTY AND PATRIOTISM EXHIBITED BY THE SOLDIERS OF THE UNITED STATES ARMY.  Whereas, the United States Army is commemorating two hundred fifty years of service to the nation since its founding on June 14, 1775. On this historic date, the Continental Congress established the Continental Army, which would eventually become the United States Army we know today; and  Whereas, over the past two and a half centuries, the Army has played a vital role in shaping the country's history, from the American Revolution to the present day. Throughout its rich and storied history, the Army has remained committed to its core values of loyalty, duty, respect, selfless service, honor, integrity, and personal courage; and  Whereas, Fort Jackson, located in Richland County, South Carolina, is a United States Army installation that was established in 1917, and it is one of the largest Basic Combat Training (BCT) centers in the United States Army, with the capacity to train up to forty-five thousand soldiers per year. Fort Jackson is home to several units, including the United States Army Training Center, the 165th Infantry Brigade, and the United States Army Chaplain Center and School; and  Whereas, the United States Army, including the active component, Army Reserves, Army National Guard, and Army Corps of Engineers, has a multibillion dollar economic impact on South Carolina's economy, and approximately 234,000 Army veterans call South Carolina home; and  Whereas, South Carolinians welcome the opportunity to pay special tribute to the men and women of the United States Army, who selflessly serve and sacrifice to protect our nation's freedom and security. As we celebrate the Army's two hundred fiftieth anniversary, we express our deepest gratitude to these courageous individuals, who put country first and stand vigilant in defense of our great nation. From the Lowcountry to the Upstate, South Carolinians join in saluting the Army's unwavering commitment to duty and honor. Now, therefore,  Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring:  That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, declare Saturday, June 14, 2025, as United States Army Day in South Carolina and encourage all citizens of this great State to reflect upon the profound sense of duty and patriotism exhibited by the soldiers of the United States Army. ----XX---

Recalled

May 6, 2025

H. 4415

Introduced by Reps. Gilliam, Alexander, Anderson, Atkinson, Bailey, Ballentine, Bamberg, Bannister, Bauer, Beach, Bernstein, Bowers, Bradley, Brewer, Brittain, Burns, Bustos, Calhoon, Caskey, Chapman, Chumley, Clyburn, Cobb-Hunter, Collins, B. J. Cox, B. L. Cox, Crawford, Cromer, Davis, Dillard, Duncan, Edgerton, Erickson, Forrest, Frank, Gagnon, Garvin, Gatch, Gibson, Gilliard, Gilreath, Govan, Grant, Guest, Guffey, Haddon, Hager, Hardee, Harris, Hart, Hartnett, Hartz, Hayes, Henderson-Myers, Herbkersman, Hewitt, Hiott, Hixon, Holman, Hosey, Howard, Huff, J. E. Johnson, J. L. Johnson, Jones, Jordan, Kilmartin, King, Kirby, Landing, Lawson, Ligon, Long, Lowe, Luck, Magnuson, Martin, May, McCabe, McCravy, McDaniel, McGinnis, Mitchell, Montgomery, J. Moore, T. Moore, Morgan, Moss, Murphy, Neese, B. Newton, W. Newton, Oremus, Pace, Pedalino, Pope, Rankin, Reese, Rivers, Robbins, Rose, Rutherford, Sanders, Schuessler, Sessions, G. M. Smith, M. M. Smith, Spann-Wilder, Stavrinakis, Taylor, Teeple, Terribile, Vaughan, Waters, Weeks, Wetmore, White, Whitmire, Wickensimer, Williams, Willis, Wooten and Yow

S. Printed 5/6/25--S.

Read the first time April 24, 2025

________

A concurrent RESOLUTION

TO DECLARE SATURDAY, JUNE 14, 2025, AS UNITED STATES ARMY DAY IN SOUTH CAROLINA AND TO ENCOURAGE ALL CITIZENS OF THIS GREAT STATE TO REFLECT UPON THE PROFOUND SENSE OF DUTY AND PATRIOTISM EXHIBITED BY THE SOLDIERS OF THE UNITED STATES ARMY.

Whereas, the United States Army is commemorating two hundred fifty years of service to the nation since its founding on June 14, 1775. On this historic date, the Continental Congress established the Continental Army, which would eventually become the United States Army we know today; and

Whereas, over the past two and a half centuries, the Army has played a vital role in shaping the country's history, from the American Revolution to the present day. Throughout its rich and storied history, the Army has remained committed to its core values of loyalty, duty, respect, selfless service, honor, integrity, and personal courage; and

Whereas, Fort Jackson, located in Richland County, South Carolina, is a United States Army installation that was established in 1917, and it is one of the largest Basic Combat Training (BCT) centers in the United States Army, with the capacity to train up to forty-five thousand soldiers per year. Fort Jackson is home to several units, including the United States Army Training Center, the 165th Infantry Brigade, and the United States Army Chaplain Center and School; and

Whereas, the United States Army, including the active component, Army Reserves, Army National Guard, and Army Corps of Engineers, has a multibillion dollar economic impact on South Carolina's economy, and approximately 234,000 Army veterans call South Carolina home; and

Whereas, South Carolinians welcome the opportunity to pay special tribute to the men and women of the United States Army, who selflessly serve and sacrifice to protect our nation's freedom and security. As we celebrate the Army's two hundred fiftieth anniversary, we express our deepest gratitude to these courageous individuals, who put country first and stand vigilant in defense of our great nation. From the Lowcountry to the Upstate, South Carolinians join in saluting the Army's unwavering commitment to duty and honor. Now, therefore,

Be it resolved by the House of Representatives, the Senate concurring:

That the members of the South Carolina General Assembly, by this resolution, declare Saturday, June 14, 2025, as United States Army Day in South Carolina and encourage all citizens of this great State to reflect upon the profound sense of duty and patriotism exhibited by the soldiers of the United States Army.

----XX---

This web page was last updated on May 06, 2025 at 08:17 PM