South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4426 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/29/2025

                            South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026

Bill 4426

Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter

(Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)

A house RESOLUTION   TO RECOGNIZE AND HONOR WILLIAM JACKSON "BILL" BREWER, SOUTH CAROLINA AMERICAN LEGION BASEBALL HALL OF FAME INDUCTEE, AND TO DECLARE MAY 22, 2025, AS "BILL BREWER DAY" IN THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA.   Whereas, the South Carolina House of Representatives is pleased to commend William Jackson "Bill" Brewer, South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame inductee, for his life of selfless service to the youth of the Palmetto State; and   Whereas, born in Clarendon County on August 19, 1942, he was the son of Harriett Rebecca Bagnal Brewer and Millard Garrell Brewer, and he grew up in the Bloomville community with four sisters. At the young age of fourteen, his lost his father, a tremendous loss for him, as well as for his family; and   Whereas, at Manning High School, Mr. Brewer played football, basketball, and baseball. His love for baseball grew as his Bagnal uncles shared their skills and knowledge of the game with him and, at the same time, helped fill the void of his late father; and   Whereas, after he graduated from high school, he attended Presbyterian Junior College in Maxton, North Carolina, to play baseball. His baseball career ended, however, after just one year because he realized that he needed to return home to help manage the family farm to assist his mother and sisters, whom he loved dearly; and   Whereas, after dating his high school sweetheart for several years, Mr. Brewer married Irene Richburg in January 1963, and together they reared four fine children: Penny, Mickey, Kelley, and Jackie. They brought their children up in the Bloomville community, where Bill started a wooden pallet company, Superior Manufacturing, which is still in operation today; and   Whereas, his love for sports has always been a central part of his life. He coached baseball at Christian Academy, Laurence Manning Academy, and Manning-Santee American Legion. Known for his energetic nature, he never liked to sit still, and if there was a ballgame within driving distance, he made a point of going; and   Whereas, Mr. Brewer has consistently supported local athletes, regardless of the school they attended. While coaching American Legion baseball, his players knew they could rely on Coach Brewer for transportation to practices and games if they needed it; and   Whereas, Mr. and Mrs. Brewer welcomed their first grandchild in 1994 and their last in 2006, eight adoring grandchildren altogether: Mary Michael, Cagney, Bateman, Brewer, Ann Bethea, Rollin, Jackson, and Emma; and    Whereas, in April 2013, Mr. Brewer suddenly lost his beloved wife, Irene, who had always been an integral part of making sure that legion baseball in Clarendon County was a success. After her passing, he has continued to be involved in legion baseball at the local and state levels; and   Whereas, November 2023, Bill Brewer was honored to be inducted into the inaugural class of the South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame. As meaningful as this honor was for him, what has always made him happy are family and friends, sports and the players he coached, and doing things for others, no matter what that may be; and   Whereas, the South Carolina House of Representatives is deeply appreciative of citizens like Bill Brewer, who seek to influence the youth of our State and who help them to grow into responsible, productive citizens. Now, therefore,   Be it resolved by the House of Representatives:   That the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives, by this resolution, recognize and honor William Jackson "Bill" Brewer, South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame inductee, and declare May 22, 2025, as "Bill Brewer Day" in the State of South Carolina.   Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to William Jackson "Bill" Brewer.  ----XX----

A house RESOLUTION

TO RECOGNIZE AND HONOR WILLIAM JACKSON "BILL" BREWER, SOUTH CAROLINA AMERICAN LEGION BASEBALL HALL OF FAME INDUCTEE, AND TO DECLARE MAY 22, 2025, AS "BILL BREWER DAY" IN THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA.

Whereas, the South Carolina House of Representatives is pleased to commend William Jackson "Bill" Brewer, South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame inductee, for his life of selfless service to the youth of the Palmetto State; and

Whereas, born in Clarendon County on August 19, 1942, he was the son of Harriett Rebecca Bagnal Brewer and Millard Garrell Brewer, and he grew up in the Bloomville community with four sisters. At the young age of fourteen, his lost his father, a tremendous loss for him, as well as for his family; and

Whereas, at Manning High School, Mr. Brewer played football, basketball, and baseball. His love for baseball grew as his Bagnal uncles shared their skills and knowledge of the game with him and, at the same time, helped fill the void of his late father; and

Whereas, after he graduated from high school, he attended Presbyterian Junior College in Maxton, North Carolina, to play baseball. His baseball career ended, however, after just one year because he realized that he needed to return home to help manage the family farm to assist his mother and sisters, whom he loved dearly; and

Whereas, after dating his high school sweetheart for several years, Mr. Brewer married Irene Richburg in January 1963, and together they reared four fine children: Penny, Mickey, Kelley, and Jackie. They brought their children up in the Bloomville community, where Bill started a wooden pallet company, Superior Manufacturing, which is still in operation today; and

Whereas, his love for sports has always been a central part of his life. He coached baseball at Christian Academy, Laurence Manning Academy, and Manning-Santee American Legion. Known for his energetic nature, he never liked to sit still, and if there was a ballgame within driving distance, he made a point of going; and

Whereas, Mr. Brewer has consistently supported local athletes, regardless of the school they attended. While coaching American Legion baseball, his players knew they could rely on Coach Brewer for transportation to practices and games if they needed it; and

Whereas, Mr. and Mrs. Brewer welcomed their first grandchild in 1994 and their last in 2006, eight adoring grandchildren altogether: Mary Michael, Cagney, Bateman, Brewer, Ann Bethea, Rollin, Jackson, and Emma; and

Whereas, in April 2013, Mr. Brewer suddenly lost his beloved wife, Irene, who had always been an integral part of making sure that legion baseball in Clarendon County was a success. After her passing, he has continued to be involved in legion baseball at the local and state levels; and

Whereas, November 2023, Bill Brewer was honored to be inducted into the inaugural class of the South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame. As meaningful as this honor was for him, what has always made him happy are family and friends, sports and the players he coached, and doing things for others, no matter what that may be; and

Whereas, the South Carolina House of Representatives is deeply appreciative of citizens like Bill Brewer, who seek to influence the youth of our State and who help them to grow into responsible, productive citizens. Now, therefore,

Be it resolved by the House of Representatives:

That the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives, by this resolution, recognize and honor William Jackson "Bill" Brewer, South Carolina American Legion Baseball Hall of Fame inductee, and declare May 22, 2025, as "Bill Brewer Day" in the State of South Carolina.

Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to William Jackson "Bill" Brewer.

----XX----

This web page was last updated on April 29, 2025 at 01:02 PM