South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina House Bill H4428 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
22
33 Bill 4428
44
55 Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
66
77 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
88
99 A house RESOLUTION TO CONGRATULATE DR. TONY BOYCE OF MT. EMMANUEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF GREENVILLE ON THE OCCASION OF HIS TWENTY-FIFTH MINISTERIAL ANNIVERSARY AND TO WISH HIM CONTINUED BLESSING IN HIS SERVICE TO THE LORD. Whereas, the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives are pleased to learn that Dr. Tony Boyce, pastor of Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church of Greenville, is celebrating his twenty-fifth pastoral anniversary this year. To mark the occasion, his church honored him with a festive banquet on April 19, 2025; and Whereas, born the youngest of three children to the Reverend George and Mrs. Alice Boyce, this native of Laurens serves the Lord with faithfulness and a vision for ministry that emphasizes full obedience to God and humble service to humanity for effective kingdom building; and Whereas, in preparation for his service as a minister of the gospel of Jesus Christ, the young Tony Boyce earned his bachelor's degree in elementary education from the College of Charleston (1999), a master's degree in divinity from Interdenominational Theological Center in Atlanta (2003), and a doctoral degree in ministry from Gardner-Webb University (2010). On April 16, 2000, he was licensed to preach the gospel by Mt. Zion Missionary Baptist Church of Laurens; and Whereas, he served first as a youth pastor (Mt. Carmel Missionary Baptist Church, Duluth, Georgia, 2002-2003) and then as assistant to the pastor (Reedy River Missionary Baptist Church, Mauldin, 2003-2008). On August 3, 2003, Tony Boyce was ordained a Baptist minister by Tumbling Shoals Baptist Association in Laurens. On February 28, 2009, he was elected the twenty-first pastor of Greenville's Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church, organized in 1896, and he shepherds his Mt. Emmanuel flock to this day; and Whereas, Tony Boyce believes strongly in personal involvement with his community, and he puts his convictions into action by serving his community in numerous capacities. He has been a board member for the Urban League of the Upstate, Greenville NAACP, Graduate Greenville, Advisory Board Black Pages, USA Inc., Piedmont Consistory #169, and Red Cross Lodge #223. He was also an Independence Party candidate for the South Carolina House of Representatives (District 25); and Whereas, further, he has served his denomination at the local, church, state, and national levels. Elected moderator of the Reedy River Baptist Association Inc. in 2019, he has served as moderator emeritus for that organization since 2024. Further, in obedience to the Lord's command to preach the gospel to the nations (Matthew 28:19), Dr. Boyce has rendered Christian service in various ways. These include his part in a mission to Migori, Kenya (ITC/Youth Hope Builders Global Initiative, 2018) and his co-establishing of Hope Builders Academy (a school for orphaned and impoverished children, also in Migori, Kenya, 2018-present). He also served as a board member of the United Christian Athletic Association (a basketball outreach to youth and adults in Greenville County, 2003-2009); and Whereas, Dr. Boyce considers it one of the greatest triumphs of his life that he was able to persuade the lovely Schevelle Thomas Boyce to become his wife. Married on May 28, 2005, they are the delighted parents of two children: Jillian Anise, born in 2009, and Antonio Josiah, born in 2013; and Whereas, with great pleasure, the members of the House honor Dr. Boyce and extend their sincere thanks for his dedicated pastoral care over a quarter-century of distinguished ministerial service. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the House of Representatives: That the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives, by this resolution, congratulate Dr. Tony Boyce of Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church of Greenville on the occasion of his twenty-fifth ministerial anniversary and wish him continued blessing in his service to the Lord. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to Dr. Tony Boyce. ----XX----
1010
1111 A house RESOLUTION
1212
1313 TO CONGRATULATE DR. TONY BOYCE OF MT. EMMANUEL MISSIONARY BAPTIST CHURCH OF GREENVILLE ON THE OCCASION OF HIS TWENTY-FIFTH MINISTERIAL ANNIVERSARY AND TO WISH HIM CONTINUED BLESSING IN HIS SERVICE TO THE LORD.
1414
1515 Whereas, the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives are pleased to learn that Dr. Tony Boyce, pastor of Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church of Greenville, is celebrating his twenty-fifth pastoral anniversary this year. To mark the occasion, his church honored him with a festive banquet on April 19, 2025; and
1616
1717 Whereas, born the youngest of three children to the Reverend George and Mrs. Alice Boyce, this native of Laurens serves the Lord with faithfulness and a vision for ministry that emphasizes full obedience to God and humble service to humanity for effective kingdom building; and
1818
1919 Whereas, in preparation for his service as a minister of the gospel of Jesus Christ, the young Tony Boyce earned his bachelor's degree in elementary education from the College of Charleston (1999), a master's degree in divinity from Interdenominational Theological Center in Atlanta (2003), and a doctoral degree in ministry from Gardner-Webb University (2010). On April 16, 2000, he was licensed to preach the gospel by Mt. Zion Missionary Baptist Church of Laurens; and
2020
2121 Whereas, he served first as a youth pastor (Mt. Carmel Missionary Baptist Church, Duluth, Georgia, 2002-2003) and then as assistant to the pastor (Reedy River Missionary Baptist Church, Mauldin, 2003-2008). On August 3, 2003, Tony Boyce was ordained a Baptist minister by Tumbling Shoals Baptist Association in Laurens. On February 28, 2009, he was elected the twenty-first pastor of Greenville's Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church, organized in 1896, and he shepherds his Mt. Emmanuel flock to this day; and
2222
2323 Whereas, Tony Boyce believes strongly in personal involvement with his community, and he puts his convictions into action by serving his community in numerous capacities. He has been a board member for the Urban League of the Upstate, Greenville NAACP, Graduate Greenville, Advisory Board Black Pages, USA Inc., Piedmont Consistory #169, and Red Cross Lodge #223. He was also an Independence Party candidate for the South Carolina House of Representatives (District 25); and
2424
2525 Whereas, further, he has served his denomination at the local, church, state, and national levels. Elected moderator of the Reedy River Baptist Association Inc. in 2019, he has served as moderator emeritus for that organization since 2024. Further, in obedience to the Lord's command to preach the gospel to the nations (Matthew 28:19), Dr. Boyce has rendered Christian service in various ways. These include his part in a mission to Migori, Kenya (ITC/Youth Hope Builders Global Initiative, 2018) and his co-establishing of Hope Builders Academy (a school for orphaned and impoverished children, also in Migori, Kenya, 2018-present). He also served as a board member of the United Christian Athletic Association (a basketball outreach to youth and adults in Greenville County, 2003-2009); and
2626
2727 Whereas, Dr. Boyce considers it one of the greatest triumphs of his life that he was able to persuade the lovely Schevelle Thomas Boyce to become his wife. Married on May 28, 2005, they are the delighted parents of two children: Jillian Anise, born in 2009, and Antonio Josiah, born in 2013; and
2828
2929 Whereas, with great pleasure, the members of the House honor Dr. Boyce and extend their sincere thanks for his dedicated pastoral care over a quarter-century of distinguished ministerial service. Now, therefore,
3030
3131 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives:
3232
3333 That the members of the South Carolina House of Representatives, by this resolution, congratulate Dr. Tony Boyce of Mt. Emmanuel Missionary Baptist Church of Greenville on the occasion of his twenty-fifth ministerial anniversary and wish him continued blessing in his service to the Lord.
3434
3535 Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to Dr. Tony Boyce.
3636
3737 ----XX----
3838
3939 This web page was last updated on April 29, 2025 at 01:04 PM