Senate | 05/07/2025 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | ||
05/07/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Introduced | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Adopted, sent to Senate | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |