05/16/2025 | Effective date 05/08/25 | |||
05/08/2025 | Signed By Governor | |||
05/06/2025 | Ratified R 26 | |||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read third time and enrolled | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Prefiled |