House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | ||
01/17/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Prefiled |