House | 04/02/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read second time | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
03/19/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry | ||
Senate | 12/11/2024 | Prefiled |