05/19/2025 | Act No. 36 | |||
05/19/2025 | Effective date 05/12/25 | |||
05/12/2025 | Signed By Governor | |||
05/08/2025 | Ratified R 54 | |||
House | 05/07/2025 | Read third time and enrolled | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Roll call Yeas-xxx Nays-xxx | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read second time | ||
05/05/2025 | Scrivener's error corrected | |||
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Roll call Ayes-xxx Nays-xxx | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | Referred to Committee on Education |