03/12/2025 | Effective date 03/07/25 | |||
03/07/2025 | Signed By Governor | |||
03/06/2025 | Ratified R 2 | |||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Amended | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Massey, Adams, Devine, Elliott, Ott |