South Carolina 2025-2026 Regular Session

South Carolina Senate Bill S0373 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 South Carolina General Assembly126th Session, 2025-2026
22
33 Bill 373
44
55 Indicates Matter StrickenIndicates New Matter
66
77 (Text matches printed bills. Document has been reformatted to meet World Wide Web specifications.)
88
99 A senate RESOLUTION TO EXPRESS PROFOUND SORROW UPON THE PASSING OF Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales AND TO EXTEND THE DEEPEST SYMPATHY TO HIS FAMILY AND MANY FRIENDS. Whereas, the members of the South Carolina Senate were deeply saddened to learn of the death of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales on February 19, 2025; and Whereas, a native of Gary, Indiana, Officer Carrizales was born on January 31, 1968, and was raised in Chicago, Illinois. He was a graduate of Central High School in East Chicago and a student of criminal justice at Central Texas College. He pursued his passion for law enforcement with diligence; and Whereas, a veteran of the United States Army, Officer Carrizales served from 1988 to 1992 as a specialist in Dental Radiology. Displaying unwavering dedication to his nation, he was deployed to the Persian Gulf during Operation Desert Storm and served for sixteen years in Germany. He was distinguishably awarded the Army Service Ribbon, the Overseas Service Ribbon, the Army Commendation Medal, the Army Good Conduct Medal, the National Defense Service Medal, the Southwest Asia Service Medal, and the Bronze Service Star; and Whereas, Officer Carrizales began his career in law enforcement with the City of Columbia police department on December 6, 2004, taking the Oath of Office on April 18, 2005. He served in various capacities-North Region Patrol, Master Police Officer, Community Services, Drug Suppression team, Special Operations Bureau, and Office of Professional Standards-always answering the call of duty with integrity and commitment; and Whereas, though he briefly stepped away for a federal position, Officer Carrizales soon realized that his heart would always remain in policing. He returned to the Columbia Police Department in 2010 to continue his mission of protecting and serving; and Whereas, most recently known for his role in protecting Columbia's leadership, Officer Carrizales was entrusted with the security detail for two Columbia mayors, current Mayor Daniel J. Rickenmann and former Mayor Stephen K. Benjamin. He ensured their safety with the same steadfast devotion he brought to every assignment; and Whereas, over the years, Officer Carrizales received a number of honors and awards, including the Columbia Police Department Officer of the Year Award and the Community Achievement Award; and Whereas, Officer Carrizales leaves to cherish his memory his parents, Javier and Celia Carrizales; his wife of thirty-four years, Gayle Carrizales; and their two children, Blake and Lauren. He will be greatly missed. Now, therefore, Be it resolved by the Senate: That the members of the South Carolina Senate, by this resolution, express profound sorrow upon the passing of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales and extend the deepest sympathy to his family and many friends. Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to the family of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales. ----XX----
1010
1111
1212
1313
1414
1515
1616
1717
1818
1919
2020
2121
2222
2323
2424
2525
2626
2727 A senate RESOLUTION
2828
2929
3030
3131 TO EXPRESS PROFOUND SORROW UPON THE PASSING OF Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales AND TO EXTEND THE DEEPEST SYMPATHY TO HIS FAMILY AND MANY FRIENDS.
3232
3333
3434
3535 Whereas, the members of the South Carolina Senate were deeply saddened to learn of the death of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales on February 19, 2025; and
3636
3737
3838
3939 Whereas, a native of Gary, Indiana, Officer Carrizales was born on January 31, 1968, and was raised in Chicago, Illinois. He was a graduate of Central High School in East Chicago and a student of criminal justice at Central Texas College. He pursued his passion for law enforcement with diligence; and
4040
4141
4242
4343 Whereas, a veteran of the United States Army, Officer Carrizales served from 1988 to 1992 as a specialist in Dental Radiology. Displaying unwavering dedication to his nation, he was deployed to the Persian Gulf during Operation Desert Storm and served for sixteen years in Germany. He was distinguishably awarded the Army Service Ribbon, the Overseas Service Ribbon, the Army Commendation Medal, the Army Good Conduct Medal, the National Defense Service Medal, the Southwest Asia Service Medal, and the Bronze Service Star; and
4444
4545
4646
4747 Whereas, Officer Carrizales began his career in law enforcement with the City of Columbia police department on December 6, 2004, taking the Oath of Office on April 18, 2005. He served in various capacities-North Region Patrol, Master Police Officer, Community Services, Drug Suppression team, Special Operations Bureau, and Office of Professional Standards-always answering the call of duty with integrity and commitment; and
4848
4949
5050
5151 Whereas, though he briefly stepped away for a federal position, Officer Carrizales soon realized that his heart would always remain in policing. He returned to the Columbia Police Department in 2010 to continue his mission of protecting and serving; and
5252
5353
5454
5555 Whereas, most recently known for his role in protecting Columbia's leadership, Officer Carrizales was entrusted with the security detail for two Columbia mayors, current Mayor Daniel J. Rickenmann and former Mayor Stephen K. Benjamin. He ensured their safety with the same steadfast devotion he brought to every assignment; and
5656
5757
5858
5959 Whereas, over the years, Officer Carrizales received a number of honors and awards, including the Columbia Police Department Officer of the Year Award and the Community Achievement Award; and
6060
6161
6262
6363 Whereas, Officer Carrizales leaves to cherish his memory his parents, Javier and Celia Carrizales; his wife of thirty-four years, Gayle Carrizales; and their two children, Blake and Lauren. He will be greatly missed. Now, therefore,
6464
6565
6666
6767 Be it resolved by the Senate:
6868
6969
7070
7171 That the members of the South Carolina Senate, by this resolution, express profound sorrow upon the passing of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales and extend the deepest sympathy to his family and many friends.
7272
7373
7474
7575 Be it further resolved that a copy of this resolution be presented to the family of Master Police Officer Christopher "Chris" Santos Carrizales.
7676
7777 ----XX----
7878
7979 This web page was last updated on February 25, 2025 at 12:15 PM