House | 05/01/2025 | Read third time and enrolled | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-15 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Introduced and read first time | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read third time and sent to House | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Committee on Education |