Senate | 02/25/2025 | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Scheduled for hearing | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 153 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | First Reading Senate S.J. 90 | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 31. H.J. 107 | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 13 |