House
|
02/19/2025
|
Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2025 H.J. 318
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2025
|
Delivered to the Governor on February 18, 2025 H.J. 298
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Signed by the President S.J. 244
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker H.J. 258
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 220
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 153
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2025
|
First Reading Senate S.J. 112
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2025
|
House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 121
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 114
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Certified uncontested, placed on consent
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 14
|
|
|