House
|
03/13/2025
|
Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2025 H.J. 543
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2025 H.J. 476
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Signed by the President S.J. 456
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker H.J. 454
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 422
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 219
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2025
|
First Reading Senate S.J. 181
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 19. H.J. 186
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 5
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2025
|
First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 113
|
|
|