Senate | 02/27/2025 | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 21. S.J. 407 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Scheduled for hearing | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 321 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 32. H.J. 331 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Prime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor H.J. 286 | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 213 | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | First Reading House H.J. 199 |