Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2025 S.J. 529
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2025 S.J. 478
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker H.J. 488
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Signed by the President S.J. 473
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 463
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 451
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Certified uncontested, placed on consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 384
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 359
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 6 Amendment 145C
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 152
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
First Reading Senate S.J. 137
|
|
|