House | 03/18/2025 | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee of Education Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 3/18/2025 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Ref. to Education Committee - Government Operations for Review | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 01/09/2025 | Filed for introduction |