House | 03/19/2025 | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/17/2025 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/5/2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/5/2025 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 2/26/2025 | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/18/2025 | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee - Government Operations for Review | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 01/24/2025 | Filed for introduction |