House | 04/16/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comp. SB subst. | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2025 | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2025 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/9/2025 | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 4/9/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/25/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Sponsor change. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Filed for introduction |