House | 04/02/2025 | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Filed for introduction |