House
|
04/17/2025
|
Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2025
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed behind the budget
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Sponsor(s) Added.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/19/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/19/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/12/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/4/2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Intro., P1C.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Sponsor change.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|