House | 04/02/2025 | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/02/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2025 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/26/2025 | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Filed for introduction |