|
04/28/2025
|
Effective date(s) 04/24/2025, 01/01/2026
|
|
|
|
04/28/2025
|
Pub. Ch. 288
|
|
|
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed by Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor for his action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Signed by Senate Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Signed by H. Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Passed H., Ayes 68, Nays 21, PNV 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Sponsor(s) Added.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
H. Placed on Regular Calendar 4/3/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Objected to on Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/25/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/18/2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Intro., P1C.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|